Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rodriguez, Alicia, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Adams, Christine M, against Associated Hand Surgeons, Cold Springs Medical Surgical Group, Hot Springs Medical Surgical Group, represented by Gonzalez, Rafael, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Employment (15) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
This complaint is filed by Alicia Rodriguez against Cold Springs Medical Surgical Group LLC, Hot Springs Medical Surgical Group, Associated Hand Surgeons, and Does 1-10. The complaint alleges various claims, including disability discrimination, failu...
Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: September 29, 2021CM5622
Date: April 20, 20222022.04.21 Defendant CMS
Date: April 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.05.12 Request for Dismissal | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
January 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230210_CM-110 | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023.01.26 Defendant's CMS | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC Cont'd: 2-10-23 |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.09.23 Defendant's CMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.