Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Insurance Company Of The West, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Morrow, David M, against Augustine Specialty Finishing, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Management Conference
Date: January 07, 202267554Reque00a283
Date: December 08, 2022Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: October 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 67554Reque00a283 | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
51775Noticeof008a8d7 Notice, Filed re Notice of Order |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC cont'd to 12/9/22 |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
51188CaseMana00877fb Case Management Statement, Filed |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
48617Requestf0008787 Request for Entry of Default, Filed |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.