Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mendez, Andres P, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Esparza, Luis, against Catalan, Jose, Catalan, Maria M, Lagunas, Guadalupe, represented by Kaestner, Jan Eric, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Santa Barbara. The plaintiff, Andres P Mendez, is suing the defendant, Maria M Catalan, for breach of contract. The complaint alleges that on March 7, 2021, a wri...
Amendment to Complaint, Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: August 26, 2021Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIV-110 | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MSC - Copy | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Catalan_11.21.22_CMC_Statement | |
October 17, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: (1) Motion to Compel; (2) Case Management Conference
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants 10.17.22 CMC_Statement | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | APM_CMC-combined - Copy | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.