Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Fraser, Marcel, Fraser, Rebecca, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Baldwin, Samantha, against Calportland Construction, City Of Santa Barbara, County Of Santa Barbara, State Of California, State Of California Department Of Transportation, (total of 5) See All represented by Dawood, Christopher E, Watts, Joshua D, Zazzeron, Ardine, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is filed by the law firm Maho & Prentice, LLP on behalf of the plaintiffs, Rebecca Fraser and Marcel Fraser. The defendants named in the complaint are the County of Santa Barbara, City of Santa Barbara, State of California Department o...
RFD - Filing
Date: March 01, 2024Complaint, Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | RFD - Filing | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Ntc of Settlement - Filing | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | 1.2251255_Ex_Parte_Application_for_Leave_to_File_2nd_MSJ_-_Fraser | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Continue Trial for filing 08 22 23 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
July 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion Summary Judgment
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Decl_of_JDW_ISO_Reply_to_ortland_s_MSJ_Fraser | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CalPortland_s_Response_t_tmt_JDW_rev_2_Fraser | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CalPortland_s_Reply_to_MSJ_JDW_rev_2_Fraser | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CalPortland_s_Response_t_dence_JDW_rev_Fraser |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.