Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Herrera, Sara, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Myers, David P, against Ocean Park Hotels-Blt, Llc, represented by Daly, Brian T, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Employment (15) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: November 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | 05_18_2022_request_for_dismissal | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice_of_Settlement_of_Entire_Case | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice_of_Settlement | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.04.08 Defendant Case Management Statement | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (North) Case Management Conference Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Answer to Complaint, Filed |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.