Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Caruso, Tatiana, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case represented by Vasquez, Cristi Michelon, against Cornejo, Jesus, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Foley, Stephen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoley, Stephen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Elder Abuse |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse Rstrain Order TRO 8-24-21 Judge: Foley, Stephen |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service, Filed Proof of Service |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing, Filed Hrg: 09/28/2021 |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order, Filed TEMP ORDERS EXP 09/28/2021 |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse Rstrain Order TRO 7-23-21 Judge: Foley, Stephen |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Cont'd: 9-28-21 8:30am SB9 TRO Granted |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document, Filed - Supplement ISO Reconsideration of Issuance of TRO |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing, Filed - HRG 08/24/2021 |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse Rstrain Order NO TRO Judge: Foley, Stephen |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Continue Court Hearing - Harassment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.