Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Roic California, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Merino, Alexander, against Ribco, Inc., represented by Ballantine, James P, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Commercial Unlawful Detainer (31) |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is an unlawful detainer case filed by ROIC California, LLC against RIBCO, INC. d/b/a Woody's BBQ. The complaint alleges that RIBCO, INC. is in possession of premises located at 5112 Hollister Ave., Santa Barbara, CA 93111, Santa Barbar...
Reply, Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Motion: Quash
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial Answer, Filed |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed Order After Hearing |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order, Received Order After Hearing, Filed |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Demurrer Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Demurrer held. Matter taken under submission. |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply, Filed Reply Brief to Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint for Unlawful Detainer |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
55071Oppositi00fff6e Opposition, Filed re PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Demurrer, Filed HRG: 04/01/2022 - NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.