Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mecono, Brian, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Cohn, Martin P, against Triant, Andrew, represented by Pro Se, Rivette, David A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Wrongful Eviction (33) |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Brian Mecono against Defendant Andrew Triant and other unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges multiple causes of action, including breach of contract, violation of Civil Code sections 1940.2 and 789.3, declarat...
Complaint, Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: July 21, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: November 17, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: November 22, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Answer, Filed
Date: September 02, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 30, 2021Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (South) Case Management Conference Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mecono v Triant - CMC statement of Defendant Case Management Statement, Filed |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Answer, Filed |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment (South) Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed This Case Shall Be Related to Case 21CV00784 |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name, Filed | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (South) Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.