Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ogilvie, Amy, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Wainwright, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Orders Denied Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Orders Denied; Cont from 11/8/21 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Denied; continued from 10/15/21 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Denied; Cont from 9/20/21 Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.