Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maderos, Heather Nichole, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Medearis, Tami, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Mediated Agreement 10/25/21; If no appearances, case will be dismissed Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing; Civil Harrassment Mediated Agreement; Remailed 11/4/21 to 810 Woodmont Ct Chico CA 95926 |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Agreement and Order
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Denied Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing;Order on Request to Continue Hearing 10/18/21 Remailed to 810 Woodmont Ct, Chico CA 95926 |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing; Order on Request to Continue Hearing |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.