Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Amaya, Brittany, Espinoza, Daisy, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Hakimi, Helga, Parsons, Joseph, Villalba, Orlando Jose, against Encompass Community Services, represented by Gillette, Jeffrey Raymond, Wetmore, Shireen Yvette, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Cogliati, Syda Kosofsky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCogliati, Syda Kosofsky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
Category(15) Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
2024-04-09 Encompass CMS (Espinoza)
Date: April 09, 202421CV02110 Joint Stip to Vacate and Stay
Date: April 03, 20242024 03-05 PLD-CMS Form cm110 (final)
Date: March 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Defendant Encompass Community Services |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-04-09 Encompass CMS (Espinoza) | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | 21CV02110 Joint Stip to Vacate and Stay | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Amaya, Brittany; Plaintiff Espinoza, Daisy |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024 03-05 PLD-CMS Form cm110 (final) | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SF192269.Case_Management_State | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Party: Attorney Hakimi, Helga; Attorney Parsons, Joseph; Attorney Villalba, Orlando Jose; Attorney Wetmore, Shireen Yvette; Defendant Encompass Community Services; Plaintiff Amaya, Brittany; Plaintiff Espinoza, Daisy |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SF187025.STIPandORD3 | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Judgment Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.