Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Long, Tonya, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Garcia, Erika Brier, against Anderson Merchandising Llp, Largent, Alicia, represented by Carruth, Michael Washburn, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiff, Tonya Long, is suing Anderson Merchandising LLP and Alicia Largent. The jurisdiction of the case is in Butte County, California. The complaint indicates tha...
Complaint
Date: August 17, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: February 09, 2022Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.