Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Amco Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Asterlin, Paul, against Blue Diamond Pools, Inc, Blue Diamond Pools, Inc., Doe Trustee Of The Mehan Family Trust Dated September 21, 2018, Mehan, Daniel C, Mehan, Taryn, (total of 5) See All represented by Bell, Tina Ann, Coffield, Jessica Brynn, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is filed by AMCO Insurance Company against Blue Diamond Pools, Inc., Daniel C. Mehan, Taryn Mehan, Doe Trustee of the Mehan Family Trust, and other unknown defendants. AMCO Insurance Company is an insurance company authorized to do bus...
Case Management Conference
Date: February 09, 2022Complaint
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 6 Day Estimate. Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant Blue Diamond Pools, Inc's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant Blue Diamond Pools, Inc's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Recusal by Judicial Officer CCP 170.1 Judge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1 Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Further Status Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.