Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Makena Court, Llc, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Kornbluh, David, against City Of Santa Cruz, represented by Geise, Alexander C., in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
CMS for 2.28.22 CMC
Date: February 08, 20222022-02-07 PropOrder.Demurrer.City.Final.FILING COPY
Date: February 08, 20222022-02-07 DeclofAG.Demurrer.City.Final.FILING COPY
Date: February 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-05-04 CityNOE.FILING COPY | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-04-22 PropOrder.SustainedDemurrerWithOutLeave.FILING COPY | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-04-12 CityReplyISODemurrer.POS.FILING COPY | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | OPP 2 Demurrer 2 Our FAC | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-04-04 CMCStmt&POS.City.FILING COPY | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-02-14 CityCMCStmt.Makena.Final.FILING COPY | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CMS for 2.28.22 CMC | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-02-07 PropOrder.Demurrer.City.Final.FILING COPY | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-02-07 DeclofAG.Demurrer.City.Final.FILING COPY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.