Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sosa, Destiny, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Caramagno, Carmela, against Santa Cruz Seaside Company, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
DEF Jury Trial Demand 01.28.22
Date: January 28, 2022DEF Answer to Complaint 01.28.22
Date: January 28, 2022DEF's CMS for 5.5.2022 CMC
Date: April 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal W POS | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Request For Dismissal [Signed] | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF Notice of Remote Appearance | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF's CMS for 5.5.2022 CMC | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CMC Stmt 20220505 | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF Jury Trial Demand 01.28.22 | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF Answer to Complaint 01.28.22 | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
(CMC) Case Management Conference Notice Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
50934ProofofS00cde70 Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.