Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fatima'S Fine Jewelry, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Se, against Chavez Marin, Alfredo, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchmal, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims: 1,501 - 5,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Schmal, Timothy |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Small Claims | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear Filed | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Schmal, Timothy |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear Filed | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Guy, Denine |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SC Plaintiff's Claim | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SC Plaintiff Claim Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.