Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Butte Business Services, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Griffith, David Richard, against Schwartz, Maurice R, Schwartz, Ryan, Sierra Silica Resources, Llc, Van Veldhuizen, Chris, represented by Swett, Thomas Michael, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Amendment to Complaint
Date: December 17, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV01996 Butte Business Services, Inc. v. Sierra Silica Resources, LLC EVENT: Motion for Attorney Fees Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. The Court will sign the Proposed Order. 3-||6. 21CV02597 St... | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Further Status Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Defendant Ryan Schwartz to First Amended Complaint Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Maurice R Swartz Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.