Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gloeckler, Heather, Paradise Park Masonic Club, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Frassetto Olsen, Anne, against Paradise Park Masonic Club, represented by Bosso, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Joint Case Management Statement
Date: February 02, 2022Notice_of_Remote_Appearance
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance - Gloeckler
Date: August 16, 2022Proposed Ex Parte Order for Motion to Continue Trial
Date: October 05, 2022Ex Parte App to Continue Trial
Date: October 05, 2022Certificate of Notice (2)
Date: October 05, 2022Dec ISO Ex Parte Continue Trial
Date: October 05, 2022Memorandum to Continue Trial
Date: October 05, 2022Revised FINAL MIL 4 - jury trial
Date: May 25, 2023FINAL Trial Brief
Date: May 25, 2023Trial - Plaintiff's Witness List
Date: May 25, 2023Trial - Plaintiff's Propsoed Jury Instructions
Date: May 25, 2023Trial - Plaintiff's MIL - 1 - Preclude Evidence
Date: May 25, 2023Trial - Plaintiff's Propsoed Verdict Forms
Date: May 25, 2023Trial - Plaintiff's Statement of the Case
Date: May 25, 2023Trial - Plaintiff's MIL - 2 - Preclude Evidence
Date: May 25, 2023FINAL Proposed Jury Instructions
Date: May 25, 2023Trial - Plaintiff's Exhibit List
Date: May 25, 2023FINAL Witness List
Date: May 25, 2023FINAL MIL 1 - exclude their expert
Date: May 25, 2023FINAL MIL 3 - SOL
Date: May 25, 2023FINAL Exhibit List
Date: May 25, 2023FINAL MIL 2 - prejudicial info re family and mail
Date: May 25, 2023Trial - Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List
Date: May 26, 2023FINAL MIL 4 - jury trial - further briefing with POS
Date: May 30, 2023Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 1
Date: May 31, 2023Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 3
Date: May 31, 2023Omnibus Declaration of A. Olsen ISO of Opposition to Defendant's MILs
Date: May 31, 2023OBJECTION TO CIVIL SUBPOENA With POS
Date: June 01, 2023MOTION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Matter Taken Under Submission (Judicial Officer: Volkmann, Timothy) | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO CIVIL SUBPOENA With POS | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Objection - No Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.