Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Scott, Henry, Ii, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Wong, Alister, against Ashford Trs Scotts Valley Llc, A Delaware Corporation, Ashford Trs Scotts Valley Lp, A Delaware Corporation, Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
230731_sCOTT_pos_TBF_
Date: March 05, 2022230731_CMS_3_29_2022_715_8101_TBF_
Date: March 05, 2022220314 (Henry) Ntc. of Settlement
Date: March 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | 232181_REQ_FOR_DISMISSAL_715_8101 | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Scott_v_Hilton_NORA | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 220314 (Henry) Ntc. of Settlement | |
March 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 230731_sCOTT_pos_TBF_ | |
March 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 230731_CMS_3_29_2022_715_8101_TBF_ | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Public Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
211025 (Scott) CMS 11.09.21 Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.