Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stadler, Peter, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barry, David N, against Fca Us, Llc, Fca Us, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Universal, Jon D, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Further CMC 041222
Date: February 07, 2022DMW Decl. re Notice of Settlement & Closure
Date: April 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | DMW Decl. re Notice of Settlement & Closure | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Further CMC 041222 | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Further Case Management Conference Judge: Carter, Marjorie |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Further CMC 041222 Notice |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stadler PLD SUB OF ATTY - STATE COURT - SIGNED Substitution of Attorney |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Public Case Management Conference Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
48656Noticeof01b8f03 Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.