Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gilbert, Tawnya, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Skinner, Troy C., against Palo Alto Medical Foundation, Sutter Health, represented by Hernaez, Alexander John, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
Category(15) Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
53195CaseM005762
Date: February 09, 202256577CaseM006502
Date: April 21, 202266363Proof016f05
Date: November 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 66363Proof016f05 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 66363Reque000015 | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 56577CaseM006502 | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | 53195CaseM005762 | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Further Case Management Conference Judge: Carter, Marjorie |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
52354CaseMana00e7104 Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
51418Noticeof01685b7 Notice |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.