Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ramirez, Brynn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Onorio, Vincent Michael, Zazzi, Kimberli C, against General Motors Llc, represented by Shugart, Jonathan Michael, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Connolly, Rebecca presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConnolly, Rebecca Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Ramirez-CMC
Date: May 06, 2022HRG 101822 Signed FURTHER CMC
Date: October 11, 2022Signed NOS
Date: October 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Ramirez (Brynn) - Signed RFD | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal Filed By: Plaintiff Ramirez, Brynn |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Conditional Settlement Stay Lifted | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Signed NOS | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement Filed | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | HRG 101822 Signed FURTHER CMC | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Ramirez, Brynn |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Defendant General Motors LLC |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | 58397CaseM00e1ad |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.