Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mora, Antonio Medina, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
Category(43) Name / Gender Change |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing on Petition to Change Name and/or Gender
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order OSC Hearing on Petition to Change Name and/or Gender Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof / Affidavit of Publication | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order/Judgment Received Fee Waiver Granted |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Filed | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Judgment Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.