Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rice, Kyra, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Se, against Bondi, Gregory, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchmal, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims Appeals |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial de Novo
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial de Novo
Judge: Schmal, Timothy |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal of Small Claims Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.