Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ramirez, Manuel I, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Vaughn, Cheryl, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedJune 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Order Denied Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Civil Harassment
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Fee Waiver - Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.