Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Graham, Kevin, Graham, Niles, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Power, Stacie Lynn, against Graham, Kevin, represented by Dunn, Linda Rae, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Complaint
Date: June 04, 2021Answer - No Fee
Date: July 06, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 08, 2021Answer - No Fee
Date: July 12, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 01, 2021Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: June 07, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Proof of Service
Date: July 12, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: June 07, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 04, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 08, 2021Declaration
Date: March 21, 2022Declaration
Date: March 14, 2022Reply
Date: March 14, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Returned Documents
Date: February 25, 2022Declaration
Date: February 18, 2022Proof of Service
Date: February 01, 2022Opposition - No Fee
Date: February 18, 2022Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: March 23, 2022Declaration
Date: January 28, 2022Notice
Date: June 10, 2021Motion - No Fee
Date: January 28, 2022Amended Complaint
Date: June 21, 2021Cross Complaint - No Fee
Date: June 10, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 01, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: August 08, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2022Judgment
Date: April 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 23, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: August 09, 2022Proof of Service
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: May 02, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 31, 2022Evidentiary Hearing - Predispo
Date: August 15, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: August 31, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: November 30, 2022Trial Readiness Conference
Date: August 10, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulated and Order Case Management Conference Resetting Trial Dates. Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulated and Order Evidentiary Hearing - Predispo 1/2 Estimate. Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Plaintiff's Case Management Statement as to Defendant Proof of Service |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulated and Order Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulated and Order Stipulation and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.