Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Andersen, Teya, Johnston, David Craig, Johnston, Teya T., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Forbes-Roberts, Samuel, Fulton, David A, against Fulbright, Will Sanders, Santa Cruz Skilled Nursing Center Inc. Dba Hearts & Hands Post Acute Care And Rehab Center, represented by Romero, Randall Hector, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
CMC Statement 03.04.2022
Date: February 10, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 10, 202253630CaseM0098aa
Date: February 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | N Settlement of Entire Case | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CMC (2) | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | POS publication | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | 59185CaseM006e46 | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | 57858NOTIC001ba6 | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration RE Notice for Ex Parte Application for Order | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Application and Order for Publication of Summons | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 53630CaseM0098aa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.