Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hassler, Clay Timothy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kutlay, Claire-Lise Y, against 1, Doe, 2, Doe, 3-50, Does, Central California Conference Of Seventh-Day Adventists, General Conference Corporation Of Seventh-Day Adventists, (total of 5) See All represented by Sturgilldiaz, Donna Lee, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
2022_02_02_Notice_of_Remote_Appearance
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Cases
Date: July 13, 20222022_07_14_HASSLER_Ntc_of_Settlement
Date: July 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.08.02 Request for Dismissal | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_07_15_HASSLER_Ntc_o_te_Appearance_filed_ | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_07_14_HASSLER_Ntc_of_Settlement | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_07_14_HASSLER_Dec_D_Diaz_re_Case_Status | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Cases | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Further Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_02_02_Notice_of_Remote_Appearance | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.02.02 NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE [TH] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.