Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Herrera Mosqueda, Juan Francisco, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eison, Owili King, against Fabian, Lorenzo Murillo, Spence Fence Company Enterprises, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
263575.863847.2022.04.21 Notice of Ruling
Date: April 26, 2022273657.916155.Request for Dismissal. Juan Herrera
Date: June 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 273657.916155.Request for Dismissal. Juan Herrera | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | 263575.863847.2022.04.21 Notice of Ruling | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Further Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
50597ProofofS00ee7c6 Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
240635.746151.Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury F Advance Jury Fee (Nonrefundable) |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
240455.745413.240455.745398.CM-110 - 12.22.21-sign Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Public Case Management Conference Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
227763.227763.CM-110 - 9.23.21-signed Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
211466.Complaint Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.