Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Ryder, Christopher S., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lewis, Stuart B, Pearce, Timothy Francis, against Future Motion, Inc., represented by Livingston, Craig Allen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
64104Notic004f0e
Date: September 28, 2022CMC Statement (FM) 111522 (Ryder) FINAL
Date: October 27, 202265743CaseM00b180
Date: November 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal Filed By: Plaintiff Ryder, Christopher S. |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CMC Statement (FM) 060723 (Ryder) FINAL | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | 76304Notic004552 | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Defendant Future Motion, Inc. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | 76252CaseM00662e | |
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CM-200 Ntc of Settlement (Ryder) FINAL | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.