Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Kelly, Earl Patrick, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobson, Kevin Y., against Ford Motor Company, represented by Tully, Kevin J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchmal, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
02.09.24 EARL PATRICK KELLY v. FMC - CMS
Date: February 09, 202411.3.22 Kelly Earl v. FMC - NOS
Date: November 03, 2022Kelly Earl v Ford_Def CMS
Date: October 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | 02.09.24 EARL PATRICK KELLY v. FMC - CMS | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Kelly, Earl Patrick |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Kelly, Earl Patrick |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | 11.8.23 Kelly Earl v. FMC - CMS | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Defendant Ford Motor Company |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Kelly Earl v Ford_Def CMS | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Kelly, Earl Patrick |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Defendant Ford Motor Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.