Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Farley, Celma, Farley, Dennis, Haines, Barbara, Haines, Jesston, Haines Sirles, Paula, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Onderick, J Michael Sean, against Debenedetti, Lois, Debenedetti, Ronald, Haines, Barbara, Haines, Jesston, Haines Sirles, Paula, (total of 7) See All represented by Keiley, Anthony James, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Haines CMCQ 02-25-22
Date: February 25, 202221CV01123_Stipulation
Date: May 13, 2022Haines CMCQ 05-19-22
Date: May 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Haines CMCQ 10-31-23 | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Cross Complainant, Defendant Haines, Walton p; Cross Complainant, Defendant Haines, Barbara; Cross Complainant, Defendant Haines Sirles, Paula; Cross Complainant, Defendant Sirles, Aaron |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Cross Complainant, Defendant Haines, Walton p; Cross Complainant, Defendant Haines, Barbara; Cross Complainant, Defendant Haines Sirles, Paula; Cross Complainant, Defendant Sirles, Aaron |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Haines CMCQ 01-31-23 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Cross Complainant, Defendant Haines, Walton p; Cross Complainant, Defendant Haines, Barbara; Cross Complainant, Defendant Haines Sirles, Paula; Cross Complainant, Defendant Sirles, Aaron |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | FARLEY_CMS_10132022 | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | FARLEY_POS_050_10132022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.