Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Federal Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Yuster, Steven H, against Central Sprinkler Company, Tyco Fire Products, Lp, represented by Corpuz, Jessica R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd (23) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference re: CMADRESS Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference - Ordered | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC Held; |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.