Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Magana, Carlos, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Se, against Solorio, Jessica Moreno, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchmal, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims: 5,001 - 10,000 |
Last RefreshedJuly 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Schmal, Timothy |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Req for Postponement of Hearing After Service (SC) | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Schmal, Timothy |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Small Claims | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SC Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.