Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital Pacific Development Group Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lebovic, Ira D, against Michael Renga Flooring Inc, represented by Young, Stephanie L, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
OC94730-NtcOfSet
Date: May 18, 20222022.1011RequestforDismissal
Date: October 12, 2022Summons Issued, Filed
Date: March 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022.1011RequestforDismissal | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference re: CMADRESS Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | OC94730-NtcOfSet | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed ESS Held on 12/7/21 with Neutral Robert Miller, Case Not Settled |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order, Received Case Management Order, Filed |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC held: CMC set for 6/14/22 at 8:30 am dept 3; Trial Confirmation set for 7/26/22 at 11:30 am dept 3; MSC set for 7/8/22 at 8:30 am dept 5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.