Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Duarte, Maria, Zamora, Cenovio, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Atterbury, Jeff Brandon, Storey, Angela, against Alencar, Roberto, Elyxir Distributing Llc., Martinez Zavalos, Kevin, represented by Budra, Michael K., in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
52643Notic00f88e
Date: January 27, 202253124Stipu001f16
Date: February 08, 202253324Docum019349
Date: February 11, 202253324STIPU005a87
Date: February 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | 53324Docum019349 | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | 53324STIPU005a87 | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 53124Stipu001f16 | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Further Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | 52643Notic00f88e | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
52643Noticeof00ab8ac Document Filed |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
52208CaseMana0098157 Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
52179CaseMana00533f8 Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.