Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Santa Cruz Harbor Village Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Windust, Paul W, against Magana, Sergio V, Sergio V. Magana Dba Cal Chi Bear Construction, represented by Baldwin, Edward Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
NOTICE
Date: April 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
51599CaseMana01ea373 Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
51599NOTICEOF00c4986 Advance Jury Fee (Nonrefundable) |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
(CMC) Case Management Conference Notice Case Management Conference Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CMS Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
JURY FEES Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.