Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Casillas Diaz , Angel, Diaz , Maria Patricia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobson, Kevin Y, against General Motors Llc, represented by Davis, Stacey S, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint alleges violations of the Song-Beverly Act by General Motors, LLC. The plaintiffs, Maria Patricia Diaz and Angel Casillas Diaz, purchased a new 2018 GMC Yukon XL from General Motors, LLC. The vehicle was delivered with serious defects ...
Case Management Order, Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 22, 20213.25.22 Diaz Maria et al v. GM NOS
Date: March 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 4.21.22-Diaz Maria v. GM-Dismissal | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | 3.25.22 Diaz Maria et al v. GM NOS | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 5DJT Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Answer to Complaint, Filed |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.