Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Eichor, David, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Smith, David Eugene, against Foster Jr., Lionel, Md, Orohealth Corporation, Oroville Hospital, Oroville Hospital Urology, Wentz, Robert J, (total of 5) See All represented by Zimmerman, Robert Harry, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior with Benson, Stephen E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenson, Stephen E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
Category(45) Unlimited Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Settlement Conference
Date: October 04, 2023Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: October 18, 2023Proof of Mailing
Date: November 06, 2023Minute Order
Date: October 04, 2023Settlement Conference Statement
Date: September 27, 2023Proof of Mailing
Date: April 24, 2023Trial Readiness Conference
Date: November 09, 2023Minute Order
Date: October 18, 2023Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: October 10, 2023Proof of Mailing
Date: October 10, 2023Order
Date: October 10, 2023Jury Trial
Date: November 13, 2023Declaration
Date: October 13, 2023Motion - Fee
Date: October 11, 2023Opposition - No Fee
Date: October 13, 2023Stipulation and Order
Date: September 27, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: April 28, 2023Stipulation and Order
Date: April 21, 2023Association of Counsel
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Returned Documents
Date: January 14, 2022Proof of Service
Date: January 25, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 02, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 09, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 15, 2021Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: December 21, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: November 30, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 25, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service
Date: December 03, 2021Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: March 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 02, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: November 17, 2021Sanctions
Date: September 15, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 15, 2021Complaint
Date: March 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2023 |
Case Management Conference Trial Reset Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
November 13, 2023 |
Stipulation & Order to Continue Trial & Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial Need Time Estimate Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
November 09, 2023 |
Stipulation & Order to Continue Trial & Mandatory Settlement Conference Trial Readiness Conference Need Time Estimate Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
November 06, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
October 18, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV00711 Eichor, David v. Lionel Foster et al. EVENT: Plaintiff’s Motion to Continue Trial Plaintiff’s Motion for a Trial Continuance is GRANTED. The trial date of November 13, 2023 and the Trial Rea... | |
October 18, 2023 |
Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial Motion hearings - Predisposition Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
October 18, 2023 |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
||
October 18, 2023 |
Tentative Ruling Plaintiff's Motion for a Trial Continuance is GRANTED. The trial date of November 13, 2023 and the Trial Readiness Conference date of November 9, 2023 are both vacated. Discovery deadlines will be commensurate with the new trial date per code. A trial setting conference is hereby scheduled for December 20, 2023 at 10:30am. Plaintiff shall prepare the form of order. |
||
October 13, 2023 |
Declaration of Attorney in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial Declaration |
||
October 13, 2023 |
Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial Opposition - No Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.