Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mathis, Eric, Mathis, Erin, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hendrickson, John Robert, against Chuck Patterson, Inc, represented by Lawrence, Allison Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order
Date: July 21, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: June 14, 2021Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: May 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion for Sanctions Order Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Hendrickson in Support of Motion for Sanctions Motion hearings - Predispo Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions is granted. Defendant Chuck Patterson, Inc. is ordered to pay sanctions pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Sections 1281.97 and 1291.99 in the amount of $12,398.23, within 30 days' notice of this order. Additionally, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 1281.97(b)(2), the Court orders the parties to arbitration, pursuant to the terms of the underlying arbitration agreement. All further judicial proceedings in this matter are stayed pending the outcome of such arbitration. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by the Plaintiffs. |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Opposition by Defendant Chuck Patterson, Inc to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Code Reply |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Motion - Fee |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Sanctions Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.