Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Meza, Xochitl, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Walmart Inc, represented by Melton, David Allen, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiff, Xochitl Meza, is filing a complaint against Walmart Inc. The jurisdiction of the case is in Butte County, California. The complaint is categorized as an unl...
Complaint
Date: March 15, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5 Day Estimate Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference 5 Day Estimate Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Settlement Conference Statement Settlement Conference Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Settlement Conference Statement Settlement Conference Statement |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement - Late Filed Case Management Statement |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Jury Trial and Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Request |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Answer Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.