Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Grisak, Merry, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Beary, Louis George, Jr., against Inter-Cal Real Estate Corporation, Peter P. Bollinger Investment Company, Llc, Ppb Oroville Llc, Raley'S, A California Corporation, represented by Kilduff, Douglas Macgregor, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Management Conference
Date: September 08, 2021Complaint
Date: March 11, 2021Amendment to Complaint
Date: March 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Continued from 12/8/21 Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Continued from 9/8/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Deposit - Non Refundable | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.