Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Dominic Investments, Roseville Flooring Inc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Roe, Robert H, Jr., West, Joseph Anthony, against Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd, The Hartford, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Butte with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
Category(18) Unlimited Insurance Coverage |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Butte |
This complaint is filed by Dominic Investments, a California LLC, and Roseville Flooring Inc., a California Corporation, against Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD, The Hartford, and Does 1 to 10. The complaint alleges two causes of action: breach of co...
Proof of Mailing
Date: February 22, 2023Order Dismissing Action
Date: February 22, 2023Minute Order
Date: December 15, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 15, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 25, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: August 25, 2021Order to Show Cause - Predisposition
Date: April 06, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 06, 2022Order to Show Cause - Court Issued
Date: February 16, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 16, 2022Declaration
Date: April 01, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: February 18, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Returned Mail
Date: March 11, 2022Review Hearing
Date: February 22, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: June 23, 2022Removal to Federal Court
Date: August 16, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 22, 2023Proof of Mailing
Date: March 04, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 13, 2022Notice
Date: February 18, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: July 13, 2022Complaint
Date: March 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 16, 2022Returned Mail
Date: March 04, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 08, 2021Order Dismissing Action
Date: February 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | Proof of Mailing | ||
February 22, 2023 |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
February 22, 2023 |
Civil Minutes Review Hearing Status of Removal to Federal Court Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
February 22, 2023 |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
||
February 22, 2023 | Conditional Settlement Stay Lifted | ||
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
August 16, 2022 |
Notice of Removal to Federal Court Removal to Federal Court |
||
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.