Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Northern California Environmental Defense Center, filed a(n) (02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate case against City Of Chico, City Of Chico City Council, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
Category(02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Management Conference
Date: September 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Status of Settlement/Dismissal Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Eric G Salbert in Support of Opening Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Petition Court Trial Hearing on Administrative Record; Time Estimate Half a Day Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference Time Estimate Half a Day Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petitioner and Plaintiff's Settlement Conference Statement Settlement Conference Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Minutes Minute Order Mandatory Settlement Conference |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Judicial Settlement Conference Worksheet | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petitioner and Plaintiff's Settlement Conference Statement Settlement Conference Statement |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Respondent Settlement Conference Statement Settlement Conference Statement |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Respondents' Opening Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandate Respondent's Reply Brief Opening Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.