Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Grigoryan, Meline, against Montoya-Stutzman, S, represented by March, Daniel Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non_Criminal Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Volkmann, Timothy |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
46246CaseMana00c55a6 Case Management / Status Conference Statement |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
40737Answerto0013a65 Answer / Response / Denial - Limited Up to $10k |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
POS_eABC_Proof_79439988 Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
PONS_eABC_Proof_79041213 Proof of Non-Service |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Midland_20-297554_sum_eABC Summons Issued / Filed |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Midland_20-297554_com_eABC Complaint Filed |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Midland_20-297554_ccs_eABC Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.