Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Eastwood, Richard B, Johnny On The Spot Portable Toilets, Inc, filed a(n) (16) Unlimited Fraud case represented by Griffith, David Richard, against Hudson Insurance Company, Johnny On The Spot Portable Toilets Inc, represented by Jacobs, Douglas Bram, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
Category(16) Unlimited Fraud |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Management Conference
Date: August 18, 2021Complaint
Date: February 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Continued from 11/17/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Cross-Complaint Answer - No Fee |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee) Cross Complaint - No Fee |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.