Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Thomas, Donell Tramaine, filed a(n) (08) Unlimited Civil Rights case represented by Baumbach, Larry L, against Chico Police Department, City Of Chico, Michael Rodden Chico Police Department Watch Commander, represented by Salbert, Eric Golas, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
Category(08) Unlimited Civil Rights |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Notice of Hearing
Date: April 12, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: March 03, 2021Removal to Federal Court
Date: April 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Status of Removal Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Further Status Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Further Status Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
City of Chico's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Further Status Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.