Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Peters, Ed, Peters, Olivia, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Smith, David Eugene, against Foster, Lionel, Jr., Oroville Hospital, Oroville Hospital Urology, represented by Hogan, Richard J, Hogan, Richard James, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2020 |
Category(45) Unlimited Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint is a legal document filed by plaintiffs Ed Peters and Olivia Peters against defendants Lionel Foster, Jr., M.D., Oroville Hospital Urology, Oroville Hospital, and Does 1 through 50. The plaintiffs allege medical negligence as the first...
Complaint
Date: February 13, 2020Order for Transfer
Date: December 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 7 Day Estimate Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
September 13, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV00287 Peters, Ed et al. v. Foster, Lionel, Jr. et al. EVENT: Defendants Lionel S. Foster, Jr. M.D. (erroneously sued as Lionel Foster Jr. M.D.), Dove’s Landing Multispecialty Practice (erroneously... | |
August 30, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 21CV00287 Peters, Ed v. Foster, Lionel, Jr. et al. EVENT: Defendants Lionel S. Foster, Jr. M.D. (erroneously sued as Lionel Foster Jr. M.D.), Dove’s Landing Multispecialty Practice (erroneously sued a... | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Resetting Trial Dates Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Time Estimate 10 Days Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference Time Estimate 10 Days Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.