Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hughes, John G, Jr., filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Brines, Michael Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Kurt W. Worley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKurt W. Worley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temporary Restraining Order Denied Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service as to Michael Wayne Brines | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Order on Fee Waiver |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Order on Request to Continue Hearing - Granted |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Req. To Continue - Civil Harassment Without Temporary Orders | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Fee Waiver - Denied
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing - Granted
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Civil Harassment
Judge: Worley, Kurt W |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.