Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcmahan, Wendy S, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Eugene, Darrel, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Petitioner's Motion for Order Vacating Void Dismissal with Prejudice Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition - No Fee Defendant's Opposition to Motion Vacating Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Motion for Order Vacating and Dismissal with Prejudice | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Amended Declaration |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Vacating Void Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing Order Dismissing Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.